This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/24/2023 at 03:18:43 (UTC).

Sutter Bay Hospitals, Inc. et al. v. Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 Sutter Bay Hospitals, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is East, Rochelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2956

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

East, Rochelle

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Sutter Bay Hospitals, Inc.

California Pacific Medical Center

Respondent

Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Parties

Lillian Forman

Herb Thomas

Julie Forman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Cyrus Ali Tabari

Gary Jason Wax

Interested Party Attorneys

Jonathan Edmund Gertler

Richard H. Schoenberger

Craig M. Peters

Jeremy Daniel Cloyd

Valerie Tallant McGinty

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate, prohibition, or other appropriate relief is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate, prohibition, or other appropriate relief is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: in support of writ petition (Ex. A rough draft of partial TX for 8/5/21 proceeding)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Real Parties in Interest hereby associated Valerie T. McGinty as appellate counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: to Opposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition requested.; Notes: oppo due 7/30/21; reply due 8/13/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid through Truefiling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Mandate, Prohibition or Other Appropriate Relief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate, Prohibition or Other Appropriate Relief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less