This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/06/2021 at 05:27:52 (UTC).

SUNRISE FINANCIAL v. S.C. (ESOLA CAPITAL INVESTMENT)

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 SUNRISE FINANCIAL filed an Other lawsuit against C ESOLA CAPITAL INVESTMENT. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5316

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

E & E Mortgage Bankers Corp.

Sunrise Financial, LLC

Respondent

Superior Court of San Diego County

1100 Union Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Interested Parties

Daniel Tepper

Saeed Kashefi

General Concepts, Inc.

Houshang Aframian

Citivest Financial Services, Inc.

Overland Direct, Inc.

Robin M. Sandoval

Crenshaw Oil, LLC

A&S Park Boulevard, LLC

Amir Aframian

Esola Capital Investment, LLC

Maria Aframian

Firooz Payan

Horizon Bancorp

Wells Fargo National Association, Inc.

Cartwright Termite & Pest Control, LLC

LOA Invests., LLC

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Andrew Ethan Hewitt

Attorney at The Leichter Firm, APC

10203 Santa Monica Boulevard, 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Benjamin G. Shatz

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kevin John Leichter

Attorney at The Leichter Firm, APC

10203 Santa Monica Boulevard, 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kevin J. Leichter

Attorney at The Leichter Firm, APC

10203 Santa Monica Boulevard, 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Interested Party Attorneys

Mark Eugene Goodfriend

Attorney at Law Offices of Mark E. Goodfriend

16055 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 800

Encino, CA 91436-2610

Scott Alan Wyman

Attorney at Attorney at Law

15915 Ventura Boulevard

Encino, CA 91436

Steven Carl Huskey

Attorney at Epport, Richman & Robbins LLP

1875 Century Park E #800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kimia Sehati

Attorney at Epport, Richman & Robbins, LLP

1875 Century Park East, Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Bart Matthew Blechschmidt

2244 Faraday Avenue

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Homan Mobasser

Attorney at Attorney at Law

18375 Ventura Boulevard, #342

Tarzana, CA 91356-4218

Alan Keith Williams

Attorney at Blanchard Krasner & French

800 Silverado Street, 2Nd Floor

La Jolla, CA 92037

George D. Rikos

Attorney at Law Offices of George Rikos

225 Broadway, Suite 2100

San Diego, CA 92101

Daniel J. McCarthy

Attorney at Hill & Burrill

300 South Grand Avenue, 37Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John Foster Whittemore

Attorney at Blanchard Krasner & French

800 Silverado Street, 2Nd Floor

La Jolla, CA 92037

Melissa Nicole Engle

Attorney at White and Bright, LLP

970 Canterbury Place

Escondido, CA 92025

Frederick W. Pfister

Attorney at White and Bright, LLP

970 Canterbury Place

Escondido, CA 92025

Jeffrey Brennan Gurrola

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Robin Meadow

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

David Bruce Owen

Attorney at Fidelity National Law Group

915 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3450

Other Attorneys

Andrew E. Hewitt

Attorney at The Leichter Firm, APC

10203 Santa Monica Boulevard, 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

1 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Stay denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & application for stay denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal docket was imported and is available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review with request for stay filed; Notes: Petitioner: Sunrise Financial, LLC Attorney: Benjamin G. Shatz Attorney: Kevin J. Leichter Petitioner: Nice Team, LLC Attorney: Benjamin G. Shatz Attorney: Kevin John Leichter Petitioner: E & E Mortgage Bankers Corp. Attorney: Benjamin G. Shatz Attorney: Kevin John Leichter (Request that Stay Order issued in S265176 remain in place.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division One; Court of Appeal Case Number: D078094; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2013-00078078-CU-BT-CTL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less