This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/09/2023 at 07:03:38 (UTC).

Sunrise Financial, LLC v. Weiss et al.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2022 Sunrise Financial, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Weiss. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Takasugi, Jon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0498

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Takasugi, Jon

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Sunrise Financial, LLC

Respondents and Defendants

Thomas J. Weiss

Weiss & Zaman

Bruce C. Gridley

Kane, Ballmer & Berkman

Manoucher Sarbaz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Ethan Hewitt

Attorney at The Leichter Firm APC

10203 Santa Monica Blvd 4Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kevin John Leichter

Attorney at The Leichter Firm, APC

10203 Santa Monica Blvd. 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Kenny C. Brooks

Attorney at Nemecek & Cole

16255 Ventura Blvd. Ste. 300

Encino, CA 91436

Michael McCarthy

Attorney at Nemecek & Cole

16255 Ventura Blvd. Suite 300

Encino, CA 91436

Robert T. Dolan

Attorney at Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

11400 W. Olympic Blvd. Suite 425

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1683

Robert M. Gilchrest

Attorney at Gilchrest Law Group

35 N Lake Ave Ste 700

Pasadena, CA 91101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.140(b), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed April 5, 2022, is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: clerk's notice of noncompliance of default on appeal dated 8/3/2022; failure to file a designation of record, pay RT fees/deposits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Sunrise Financial, LLC Attorney: Andrew Ethan Hewitt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Sunrise Financial, LLCAttorney: Andrew Ethan Hewitt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (4/5/2022 by Sunrise Financial, LLC ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check# 3208 for $775

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 4/5/2022 by Sunrise Financial, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV24794; Trial Court Judge: Takasugi, Jon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less