This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/01/2021 at 19:58:53 (UTC).

Sunrise Financial, LLC et al. v. The Superior Court of San Diego County/Esola Capital Investment, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Sunrise Financial, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of San Diego County/Esola Capital Investment, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Wohlfeil, Joel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8094

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Wohlfeil, Joel

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Sunrise Financial, LLC

E&E Mortgage Bankers Corp.

Respondent

The Superior Court of San Diego County

Interested Parties

Daniel Tepper

Saeed Kashefi

General Concepts, Inc.

Houshang Aframian

Citivest Financial Services, Inc.

Overland Direct, Inc.

Robin M. Sandoval

Crenshaw Oil, LLC

A&S Park Boulevard, LLC

Amir Aframian

Esola Capital Investment, LLC

Maria Aframian

Firooz Payan

Horizon Bancorp

Wells Fargo National Association, Inc.

Cartwright Termite & Pest Control, LLC

LOA Invests., LLC

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Andrew Ethan Hewitt

Attorney at The Leichter Firm APC

10203 Santa Monica Blvd 4Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kevin John Leichter

Attorney at The Leichter Firm, APC

10203 Santa Monica Blvd., 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Benjamin Shatz

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips

11355 W. Olympic Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Interested Party Attorneys

Mark Eugene Goodfriend

Attorney at Law Offices of Mark E. Goodfriend

16055 Ventura Blvd., Ste. 800

Encino, CA 91436-2610

Scott Alan Wyman

15915 Ventura Blvd.

Encino, CA 91436

Steven Carl Huskey

Attorney at Epport, Richman & Robbins LLP

1875 Century Park E #800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kimia Sehati

Attorney at Epport, Richman & Robbins, LLP

1875 Century Park East, Ste. 800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Bart Matthew Blechschmidt

2244 Faraday Ave.

Carlsbad, CA 92008

George D Rikos

Attorney at Law Offices of George Rikos

225 Broadway, Suite 2100

San Diego, CA 92101

Alan Keith Williams

Attorney at Blanchard Krasner & French

800 Silverado St., 2Nd Fl.

La Jolla, CA 92037

Homan Mobasser

18375 Ventura Blvd # 342

Tarzana, CA 91356-4218

Daniel J. McCarthy

Attorney at Hill & Burrill

300 So. Grand Avenue, 37Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John Foster Whittemore

Attorney at Blanchard Krasner & French

800 Silverado St., 2Nd Fl.

La Jolla, CA 92037

Philip Alan Metson

1875 Century Park East, Ste. 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2523

Melissa Nicole Engle

Attorney at White and Bright, LLP

970 Canterbury Place

Escondido, CA 92025

Frederick W. Pfister

Attorney at White and Bright, LLP

970 Canterbury Place

Escondido, CA 92025

David Bruce Owen

Attorney at Fidelity National Law Group

915 Wilshire Blvd Ste 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3450

Jeffrey Brennan Gurrola

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Robin Meadow

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: Filed November 17, 2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate and/or prohibition or other appropriate relief and request for immediate stay have been read and considered by Justices Benke, Huffman, and O'Rourke. The petition and request are DENIED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate and/or prohibition or other appropriate relief and request for immediate stay have been read and considered by Justices Benke, Huffman, and O'Rourke. The petition and request are DENIED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate/Prohibition with stay request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A&S Park Boulevard LLC is a litigant