This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/31/2021 at 12:51:33 (UTC).

Sublett v. Breathed et al. **C/W B309459**

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Sublett filed an Other lawsuit against Breathed C/W B309459. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Maxwell, Pauline. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1640

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Maxwell, Pauline

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Bradford Sublett

Defendants and Appellants

Guy Berkeley Breathed

Heather Standish Wright

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Claire Kathleen Mitchell

Attorney at Fell, Marking, Abkin, Montgomery, Granet

222 East Carrillo Street 4Th Floor

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Benjamin Patrick Pugh

Attorney at Holland & Knight

3 Park Plz #1400

Irvine, CA 92614-5976

Eric Golas Salbert

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

3 Park Plz Ste 1400

Irvine, CA 92614

Craig S. Granet

Attorney at Fell Marking Abkin

200 E. Carrillo St. Suite 400

Santa Barbara, CA 93101-2142

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Robert Mark Carney

Attorney at Reicker Pfau

1421 State St Ste B

Santa Barbara, CA 93101-2507

Kevin Robert Nimmons

Attorney at Reicker PFau Pyle & McRoy LLP

1421 State Street, Suite B

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Meghan Kathleen Woodsome

Attorney at Reicker, Pfau, Pyle & McRoy LLP

1421 State St Ste B

Santa Barbara, CA 93101-2507

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • DispositionDescription: All documents refiled into different case; Disposition Type: Final Cons. order filed 4-23-21 **B309459**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Documents refiled.; Notes: **B309459**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed order consolidating with case:; Notes: The parties filed a joint stipulation to consolidate the above-entitled appeals. We grant consolidation; the appeals are consolidated for purposes of briefing, oral argument, and decision. All future filings are to be made under appellate case number B309459. Appellants Guy Berkeley Breathed and Heather Standish Wright shall serve and file an opening brief and appellants' appendix within forty (40) days from the date the reporter's transcript, designated in B311640, is filed. Appellant Bradford C. Sublett shall serve and file a combined respondent's and appellant's opening brief sixty (60) days from the filing of appellants Breathed and Wright's opening brief. Appellants Breathed and Wright shall serve and file a combined appellants' reply and respondents' brief thirty (30) days after the filing of Sublett's combined respondent's and appellant's opening brief. Appellant Sublett may an appellant's reply brief thirty (30) days from the filing of appellants Breathed and Wright's combined reply and respondents' brief. [ . . . ]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: dtd 4-21-21 from SBSC; register of actions**B309459**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: dtd 4-19-21 from SBSC**B309459**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A filed 4-9-2021 by G. Breathed/H. Wright challenging 2-22-2021 j/or**B309459**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Barbara County Superior Court - Main; County: Santa Barbara; Trial Court Case Number: 17CV00123; Trial Court Judge: Maxwell, Pauline

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Robert Nimmons