This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/19/2021 at 02:54:29 (UTC).

STUEVE BROS. FARMS v. S.C. (MEYER)

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 STUEVE BROS FARMS filed an Other lawsuit against C MEYER. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8520

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Millcreek Farming Associates, LLC

Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC

Respondent

Superior Court of Orange County

Attn: Hon. Richard Y. Lee, Dept C31 700 West Civic Center Drive,

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Party

Michael Meyer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Robert E. Barnes

Attorney at Barnes Law

700 South Flower Street, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Interested Party Attorney

Richard A. Cohn

Attorney at Aitken Aitken & Cohn

3 Macarthur Place, Suite 800

Santa Ana, CA 92707

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including July 28, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC Attorney: Robert E. Barnes Petitioner: Millcreek Farming Associates, LLC Attorney: Robert E. Barnes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Three; Court of Appeal Case Number: G060112; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Orange County Superior Court - Central; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2019-01077549

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STUEVE BROS. FARMS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where M-I, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant