This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/17/2022 at 09:05:59 (UTC).

STROBEL v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 STROBEL filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1564

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Jo Ann Strobel

Douglas Strobel

Defendants and Respondents

Johnson & Johnson

Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.

Spanos Przetak

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Gilbert Lynn Purcell

Attorney at Brayton Purcell LLP

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

Steven John Patti

Attorney at Brayton Purcell LLP

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

Jason Michael Rose

Attorney at Brayton Purcell, LLP

222 Rush Landing Road P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948

Richard M. Grant

Attorney at Brayton Purcell LLP

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

Christine Ann Renken

Attorney at Brayton Purcell LLP

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Stacy Lynn Foster

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2073

Susan V. Vargas

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

633 West 5Th Street - Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Alexander G. Calfo

Attorney at King & Spalding

633 West 5Th Street - Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Paul R. Johnson

Attorney at King and Spalding

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Evanthia M. Spanos

Attorney at Spanos Przetak

475 14Th Street, Suite 550

Oakland, CA 94612

Laura Przetak

Attorney at Spanos Przetak

475 14Th Street, Suite 550

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Letter regarding Quarterly Status Report filed by Paul Johnson, counsel for respondents.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Letter regarding Quarterly Status Report filed by Paul Johnson, counsel for respondent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of substitution of counsel; Notes: Richard Grant and Christine Renken are no longer with the Firm. Updated records to reflect the following as counsel for Appellant's in the above referenced case: GILBERT L. PURCELL JASON M. ROSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Letter regarding Quarterly Status Report filed by Paul Johnson, counsel for respondent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed: cause suspended due to bankruptcy stay; Notes: The court is in receipt of a notice from respondent that a bankruptcy petition has been filed. Such notice operates as an automatic stay in this proceeding and the applicable time periods of rule 8.512(b) of the California Rules of Court are hereby suspended. Counsel for the respondent is directed to file quarterly reports with the Clerk of this court regarding the status of this bankruptcy action. At such time as this court receives proper notice terminating or granting relief from the bankruptcy stay of proceedings, the court will enter an order terminating the suspension of the applicable time periods of rule 8.512(b) and said time periods shall begin running anew from the date of that order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of bankruptcy stay filed; Notes: Notice of Bankruptcy Stay and Preliminary Injunction Johnson & Johnson, Defendant and Respondent Paul R. Johnson, Retained counsel Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Defendant and Respondent Paul R. Johnson, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Jo Ann Strobel Attorney: Christine Ann Renken

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record was imported and is available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Johnson & Johnson Attorney: Paul R. Johnson Defendant and Respondent: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Attorney: Paul R. Johnson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: A159609; Disposition: Reversed & remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: Solano County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: FCS052548

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacy Lynn Foster

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul R. Johnson