This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/26/2021 at 02:20:59 (UTC).

Strength Transportation Management, Inc. v. The Superior Court of Orange County

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 Strength Transportation Management, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Orange County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Margines, Charles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0023

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Margines, Charles

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Strength Transportation Management, Inc.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Orange County

Hon. Charles Margines 700 Civic Center Dr West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Parties

Naomi Yakota

Dustin Mehl

Richard Mehl

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Timothy A. Gravitt

Attorney at Collinsworth Specht Calkins Giampaoli

4695 Macarthur Blvd Ste 370

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Mark Thomas Collinsworth

Attorney at Collinsworth Specht Calkins & Giampaoli

4695 Macarthur Blvd Ste 370

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Michael D. May

532 W. 1St St., Ste. 209

Claremont, CA 91711

Interested Party Attorneys

J. Derek Pakiz

Attorney at Law Offices Of Robert Reeves

200 W. Santa Ana Blvd. Suite 630

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Marc B Thompson

Attorney at The Reeves Law Group

200 W Santa Ana Boulevard Suite 600

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: E-filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for a writ of mandate is DENIED. MOORE, ACTING P. J. * Before Moore, Acting P. J., Ikola, J., and Thompson, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: AMENDED 7 Vol of Exhibits. PP.(1128)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: CIP proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed.; Notes: filed by petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: writ petition POS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: 7 volumes of exibits (1128 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: E-service for writ petition and exhibits; missing proof of service to superior court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Writ of Mandate Petitioner: Strength Transportation Management, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2019-01081436; Trial Court Judge: Margines, Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Strength Transportation Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMPSON MARC B.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAKIZ J. DEREK ESQ.