This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 12/04/2021 at 20:08:17 (UTC).

Stevenson v. County of Los Angeles et al.

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 Stevenson filed an Other lawsuit against County of Los Angeles. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Salter, Glenn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0608

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Salter, Glenn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Stevie J. Stevenson

Vacaville, CA 95696

Respondents and Defendants

County of Los Angeles

Don Syn

Brentford Ferreira

Corene Locke-Noble

Ian Phan

Patricia Wilkinson

The Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Craig Richman

City of Los Angeles

Norman Jackson

Larry Hedwall

James Bisnow

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Lee Overton

Attorney at Cummings McClorey Davis Acho & Assoc.

3801 University Ave Suite 560

Riverside, CA 92501

Tomas Antonio Guterres

Attorney at Collins & Collins LLP

790 E Colorado Blvd Ste 600

Pasadena, CA 91101

Matthew William McAleer

Attorney at Ofc City Attorney

200 N Main St Fl 6 City Hall East

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Kathleen Alice Kenealy

Attorney at City of Los Angeles

200 N Main St Ste 800

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4133

James Andrew Chortanian

Attorney at Doyle Schafer McMahon, LLP

5440 Trabuco Rd

Irvine, CA 92620-5704

Terrence J. Schafer

Attorney at Doyle Schafer & McMahon LLP

5440 Trabuco Road

Irvine, CA 92620

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Letter by APLT to Supreme Court regarding motion to apprise court that appellant is submitting the amended notice designating record on appeal to Superior Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: motion to apprise court that appellant is submitting the amended notice designating record on appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Superior Court motion to apprise court that appellant is submitting the amended notice designating record on appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: Appellant's motion to vacate the dismissal, reinstate the appeal, and be relieved from default is GRANTED. The order of dismissal is VA CA TED and the appeal is REINS TA TED. The clerk of this court is directed to file forthwith appellant's Civil Case Information Statement submitted with the motion. Orange County Superior Court, Appellate Division is directed to accept the designation of the record on appeal, provided the designation is presented within 30 days of the date of this order. If appellant fails to comply, and the Superior Court notifies this court of the non-compliance, the appeal may be dismissed.Order mailed to appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Aplt's mtn's to vacate dismissal and reinstate appeal & CCIS (received only)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: Aplt's CCIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: By aplt, mtn to reinstate appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: By aplt motion to vacate dismissal of appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: By aplt, mtn to Superior Court for relief from default for failure to file timely designation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: Pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.140(b)(1), the appeal filed August 16, 2021, is DISMISSED for appellant's failure to designate the record on appeal in a timely manner and for having failed to file a Civil Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g), after notice that appellant was in default. Appellant is advised that this dismissal will become final as to this court 30 days after the date of this order, at which time this court will lose the power to vacate, reconsider or modify it. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.264(b)(1).) A motion to vacate dismissal requires a showing of good cause. To allow the court sufficient time to review and evaluate the showing of good cause, a motion to vacate dismissal should be filed well before the 30-day jurisdictional deadline.Mailed to APLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Notice of failure to comply w/notice of default re: designation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Pursuant to the filing of a Request to Waive Court Fees and Costs, and with good cause appearing therefor, IT IS ORDERED that appellate court fees and costs for the above-entitled action are waived pursuant to rule 8.26. This fee waiver applies only to the appellate fees and costs identified in California Rules of Court, rule 8.26(e) [appellate court filing fee; court fee for telephonic oral argument]. Any request for a waiver of superior court costs and fees must be addressed to the superior court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Mailed default notice to appellant (pro per)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Aplt: Stevie J. Stevenson (pro per)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCP03567; Trial Court Judge: Salter, Glenn

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHORTANIAN JAMES A.