This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/10/2022 at 12:46:16 (UTC).

STEVENS (DEAN MICHAEL) ON H.C.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 STEVENS DEAN MICHAEL ON H C was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8678

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Dean Michael Stevens

Ukiah, CA 95482

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for writ of H.C. denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of habeas corpus denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Documents entitled, "Motion to Change Writ to Extraordinary Writ of Habeas" Dean Michael Stevens, Petitioner Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: additional documents. by Dean Michael Steven, petitioner, in pro per.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: additional documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: additional documents by Dean Michael Stevens, petitioner, in pro per.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Received additional document from the petitioner in pro per.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Additional documentation entitled "Affidavit" dated May 12, 2021.Dean Michael Stevens, Petitioner Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: "Affidavit" from petitioner in pro per.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: letter dated May 11, 2021. by Dean Michael Stevens, petitioner, in pro per.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: miscellaneous document from petitioner.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: miscellaneous document from petitioner.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of habeas corpus filed; Notes: Petitioner: Dean Michael Stevens Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less