Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 06/08/2021 at 04:32:31 (UTC).

Steshenko v. Foothill-De Anza Community College et al.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 Steshenko filed an Other lawsuit against Foothill-De Anza Community College. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Manoukian, Socrates. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8729

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Sixth Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Manoukian, Socrates

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Gregory Nicholas Steshenko

Aptos, CA 95003

Defendants and Respondents

Anita Muthyala-Kandula

Stanford Health Care

ValleyCare Medical Center

Lorrie Ranck

Patricia Buchner

Foothill-De Anza Community College

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Mark Aaron Palley

Attorney at Marion's Inn

436 14Th St Ste 1305

Oakland, CA 94612-2150

Elizabeth R Leitzinger

Attorney at Fenton & Keller

Po Box 791

Monterey, CA 93942

Michael David Bruno

Attorney at Gordon & Rees

275 Battery St 20Th Fl Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Roy Combs

Attorney at Fagen Friedman and Fulfrost, LLP

70 Washington Street, Suite 205

Oakland, CA 94607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: Appellant's motion for stay pending appeal is denied. (Greenwood, P.J., Grover, J., and Danner, J. participated in this decision.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record preparation inquiry sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Appellant's motion to stay trial pending final determination of this appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Applt, order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS rejected due to parties/representation unclear.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS rejected. Missing order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Gregory N. Steshenko, Filed 12/28/20

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOOTHILL-DE ANZA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT (FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-11-511636) is a litigant

Latest cases where VALLEYCARE MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PALLEY MARK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COMBS ROY A.