This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/29/2022 at 04:00:53 (UTC).

State of California et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Linfield, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8175

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Linfield, Michael

 

Party Details

Petitioners

State of California

Warren A. Stanley

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Michael P. Linfield

Interested Parties

Robert Mann

Youth Justice Coalition

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Danielle F O'Bannon

Donna M. Dean

Robert Andres Bonta

Molly Murphy

Jeffrey Richard Vincent

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Interested Party Attorneys

Donald W. Cook

Nisha Kashyap

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition denied or dismissed after order to show cause issued.; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition denied or dismissed after order to show cause issued.; Notes: The court is in receipt of a minute order dated February 25, 2022, reflecting the respondent court's decision to vacate its order of February 4, 2022, and to sustain petitioner's objection to any order compelling former Commissioner Warren A. Stanley to testify at trial. Because that order is in compliance with the alternative writ of mandate issued February 10, 2022, the alternative writ is discharged and the petition for writ of mandate, filed February 8, 2022, is dismissed as moot.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: 2/25/2022 minute order obtained from LASC; filed by petitioner's counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Alternative writ or OSC issued.; Notes: TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY: The petition for writ of mandate, filed February 8, 2022, having been read and considered, and good cause appearing therefor, you are hereby ordered either to: (a) After hearing the parties' positions on the matter pursuant to Brown, Winfield & Canzoneri, Inc. v. Superior Court (2010) 47 Cal.4th 1233, 1250, footnote 10, vacate your order of February 4, 2022, overruling petitioner's objection to any effort to compel former Commissioner Warren A. Stanley top testify at trial, and enter a new and different order sustaining the objection; or (b) In the alternative, show cause before this court in its courtroom at 300 South Spring Street, Los Angeles, California 90013, on April 21, 2022, at 12:45 p.m., why a peremptory writ of mandate ordering you to do so should not issue. The return to the petition, if any, shall be filed on or before March 14, 2022. A traverse to the return, if any, shall be filed on or before March 30, 2022. The order overruling petitioner's objection is stayed pending resolution of the petition or further order of the court. If you comply with this writ by selecting alternative (a) above, you are directed to provide this court with a copy of your minute order setting forth such compliance. Petitioner shall also provide this court with a copy of any such minute order upon receipt. WITNESS THE HONORABLE ELWOOD LUI, Presiding Justice of Division Two of the Court of Appeal of the State of California, Second Appellate District. ATTEST my hand and the seal of this court this 10th day of February 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: RPI preliminary opposition to petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: petitioner's supplemental exhibit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stay order filed.; Notes: The court has completed its initial review of the petition for writ of mandate, filed February 8, 2021. The request for an immediate stay is granted as to the respondent court's February 4, 2022 ruling that former Commissioner Warren A. Stanley's may be compelled to testify at trial.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: One volume of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate with STAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less