Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 06/01/2021 at 20:00:16 (UTC).

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. OETIKER

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against OETIKER. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6860

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Court:

    California Supreme Court

  • Courthouse:

    California Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

State Farm General Insurance Company

Defendant and Respondent

Oetiker, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Jeffery Alan Korinko

Attorney at Watkins & Letofsky, LLP

2900 S Harbor Boulevard, Suite 240

Santa Ana, CA 92704-6400

Daniel W. Berglund

Attorney at Grotefeld Hoffman LLP

150 South Fifth Street, Suite 3650

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jordan Bryan Everakes

Attorney at Grotefeld Hoffmann LLP

700 Larkspur Landing Circle, Suite 280

Larkspur, CA 94939

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Melanie Marie Smith

Attorney at Selman Breitman LLP

11766 Wilshire Boulevard, 6Th Floor

San Diego, CA 90025-6538

Elaine Katherine Fresch

Attorney at Selman & Breitman

11766 Wilshire Boulevard, Sixth Floo Sixth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025-6538

Rachel Elizabeth Hobbs

Attorney at Selman Breitman LLP

11766 Wilshire Boulevard, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025-6538

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Depub. request(s) denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & depublication request(s) denied; Notes: The application to appear as counsel pro hac vice is granted. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 9.40(a).) The petition for review is denied. The request for an order directing depublication of the opinion is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including April 27, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: State Farm General Insurance Company Attorney: Jordan Bryan Everakes Answer to petition for review filed. Due on 03/01/2021 By 24 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Answer to petition for review missing certificate of word count. Counsel was asked to resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application to appear as counsel pro hac vice (pre-grant); Notes: **Daniel W. Berglund requesting to appear as pro hac**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition to depublication request filed; Notes: State Farm General Insurance Company, Plaintiff and Appellant Jordan Bryan Everakes, Associated counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Opposition to depublication request filed on 2/16/21. Counsel was asked to submit an application to appear as pro hac vice in order for the document to be filed or submit the document with California counsel. State Farm General Insurance Company, Plaintiff and Appellant Daniel W. Berglund, Pro hac vice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Extension of time granted; Notes: On application of respondent and good cause appearing, it is ordered that the time to serve and file the answer to petition for review is extended to and including March 1, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication (petition for review pending); Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Oetiker, Inc. Attorney: Elaine Katherine Fresch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for extension of time filed; Notes: By Jordan Everakes, counsel for respondent, seeking an extension to March 3, 2021 to file an answer to petition for review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse (volume 1 of 1).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Oetiker, Inc. Attorney: Elaine Katherine Fresch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 6; Court of Appeal Case Number: B302348; Disposition: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: San Luis Obispo County Superior Court - Main (SLO Court 1); Trial Court Case Number: 18CV-0046

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oetiker, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH MELANIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOBBS, RACHEL E