This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 09/15/2021 at 13:32:36 (UTC).

State Compensation Insurance Fund v. Department of Insurance et al.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 State Compensation Insurance Fund filed an Other lawsuit against Department of Insurance. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gevercer, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3897

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Gevercer, Steven

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

State Compensation Insurance Fund

Respondents and Defendants

Department of Insurance et al.

A-Brite Blind & Drapery Cleaning

Respondent and Interested Party

A-Brite Blind & Drapery Cleaning

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Seaton Tsai

Attorney at State Compensation Insurance Fund

900 Corporate Center Drive, Suite 401

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

David M Meeker

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255 1300 I Street

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Debbie J. Vorous

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 911255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Drew E. Pomerance

Attorney at Roxborough, Pomerance, Nye & Andreani, LLP

5820 Canoga Avenue, Suite 250

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

David Ryan Ginsburg

Attorney at Roxborough, Pomerance, Nye & Andreani, LLP

5820 Canoga Avenue, Suite 250

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Respondent and Interested Party Attorneys

Drew E. Pomerance

Attorney at Roxborough, Pomerance, Nye & Andreani, LLP

5820 Canoga Avenue, Suite 250

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

David Ryan Ginsburg

Attorney at Roxborough, Pomerance, Nye & Andreani, LLP

5820 Canoga Avenue, Suite 250

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellant's motion to enforce jurisdiction with request for stay is denied. HULL, Acting P.J.; MAURO, J.; MURRAY, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: By respondents Department of Insurance et al. to appellant's "Motion to Enforce Jurisdiction of the Appellate Court Under C.C.P. Section 923 and Stay Respondent CDI's Collateral Estoppel Orders Pending a Decision on Appeal," with CIEP and declaration of Debbie Vorous in support of the opposition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: By respondent A-Brite Blind & Drapery Cleaning to appellant's "Motion to Enforce Jurisdiction of the Appellate Court Under C.C.P. Section 923 and Stay Respondent CDI's Collateral Estoppel Orders Pending a Decision on Appeal," with declaration of David Gisburg in support of the opposition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Appellant advising the briefing schedule in file numbers ANBWCA2013 and AHBWCA1847 has been continued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: appellant clarifying urgency of request for stay.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Andrew P.P. Dunk, III, in support of appellant's request for stay.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Seaton Tsai in support of appellant's request for stay.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for stay filed.; Notes: By appellant. Request entitled "Motion to Enforce Jurisdiction of the Appellate Court under C.C.P. Section 923 and Stay Respondent CDI's Collateral Estoppel Orders Pending a Decision on Appeal."

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 06/04/21. Designating CT, RT, administrative record, and exhibits.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's Civil Case Information Statement rejected. No copy of judgment or order attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's mediation statement filed.; Notes: Respondent's mediation statement due: 05/17/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid by appellant. Receipt #R324882.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: notice that DAG Debbie J. Vorous, SBN: 166884, will represent respondents in place of DAG David M. Meeker.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re CAMS.; Notes: Due 10 days after appellant's filing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter to counsel advising of due date of Civil Case Information Statement.; Notes: and Appellant's Mediation Statement due: 5/5/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Filing fee or fee waiver due: 5/5/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 4/7/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Sacramento County Superior Court; County: Sacramento; Trial Court Case Number: 34201980003164CUWMGDS; Trial Court Judge: Gevercer, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Ryan Ginsburg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POMERANCE, DREW E.