This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 09/18/2021 at 03:13:54 (UTC).

State Compensation Insurance Fund et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 State Compensation Insurance Fund filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hogue, Amy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9429

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hogue, Amy

 

Party Details

Petitioners

State Compensation Insurance Fund

Does 1 through 50

Respondents

Hon. Amy D. Hogue

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Parties

Resilience Treatment Center

American Jetter & Plumbing, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Anthony Lewis

Attorney at State Compensation Insurance Fund

2275 Gateway Oaks Dr

Sacramento, CA 95833-3224

Noah Graff

Attorney at State Compensation Insurance Fund

900 Corporate Center Dr

Monterey Park, CA 91754-7618

John Bernard de Leon

Attorney at State Compensation Insurance Fund

900 Corporate Center Dr.

Monterey Park, CA 91754-7618

Robert Timothy O'Connor

2945 Townsgate Road, Ste 200

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Betsy Carol Manifold

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein et al LLP

750 B St Ste 1820

San Diego, CA 92101-8122

Brittany Nicole DeJong

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz

750 B St Ste 2770

San Diego, CA 92101-8113

Michael Milton Liskow

Attorney at Calcaterra Pollack LLP

1140 Avenue Of The Americas Fl 9

New York, NY 10036-5803

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate/stay, filed December 18, 2020; the letter brief filed by real parties in interest, filed March 26, 2021; the letter brief filed by petitioner, filed April 5, 2021; and the transcript of the April 1, 2021 hearing, filed April 6, 2021, have been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate/stay, filed December 18, 2020; the letter brief filed by real parties in interest, filed March 26, 2021; the letter brief filed by petitioner, filed April 5, 2021; and the transcript of the April 1, 2021 hearing, filed April 6, 2021, have been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: (1) Reporter's Transcript dated April 1, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Notice of lodging of transcript of State Compensation Insurance Fund's Motion for Reconsideration Hearing held on April 1, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Petitioners are requested to provide a status update regarding the April 1, 2021 hearing on the pending motion for reconsideration, along with copies of any minute orders issued by the superior court after the date of filing of the petition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Supplemental points and authorities filed by:; Notes: real parties in interest American Jetter & Plumbing Inc. and Resilience Treatment Center, to provide notice of significant new authority. Villanueva v. Fid. Nat'l Title Co., No. S252035, 2021 Cal. LEXIS 1914 (Mar. 18, 2021),

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Within two business days after the April 1, 2021 hearing on the pending motion for reconsideration, Petitioners are requested to provide a status update along with copies of any minute orders issued by the superior court after the date of filing of the petition. The status update may be filed electronically with the Division One clerks at 2d1.clerk1@jud.ca.gov.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: On or before March 25, petitioners are requested to provide a status update regarding the March 23, 2021 hearing on the pending motion for reconsideration, along with copies of any minute orders issued by the superior court after the date of filing of the petition. The status update may be filed electronically with the Division One clerks at 2d1.clerk1@jud.ca.gov.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits Volumes 1-4 (Out of 4)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: STAY REQUESTED; Petition for Writ of Mandate, Prohibition or Other Appropriate Writ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant