This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/31/2022 at 01:07:02 (UTC).

Stars and Bars, LLC v. Crown Valley Holdings, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 Stars and Bars, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Crown Valley Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Zeltzer, Nancy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1353

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Zeltzer, Nancy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Stars and Bars, LLC

Respondents and Defendants

Crown Valley Holdings, LLC

Westport Capital Partners, LLP

WCP Real Estate Fund l Holdings, LLC

WCP Real Estate Fund ll, L.P.

WCP Real Estate Fund ll (A), L.P.

WCP Real Estate Fund ll (B), L.P.

Sentinel Development Services, Inc.

Riptide Restaurants, Inc.

Baker Commodities, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Mitchell Keiter

424 S Beverly Drive

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Peter John Burfening, Jr.

Attorney at Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP

501 W Broadway Ste 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

Betty M. Shumener

Attorney at Shumener Odson & Oh LLP

550 South Hope Street, Ste 1050

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Robert A. Olson

Attorney at Greines Martin Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Joshua D Bordin-Wosk

Attorney at Bordin Semmer LLP

6100 Center Dr Ste 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90045

John A. Delis

Attorney at Long & De;os

400 N Tustin Ave Ste 370

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • HearingDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: E-mailed to appellant counsel with confirmation of delivery.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Aplts: Stars and Bars, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2017-00926590; Trial Court Judge: Zeltzer, Nancy

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIPTIDE RESTAURANTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Stars & Bars Outdoors, Inc is a litigant