This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/15/2022 at 03:28:15 (UTC).

Stanislaus Co. Community Services Agency v. D.B.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 Stanislaus Co Community Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against D B. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rees, Annette. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4230

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Rees, Annette

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Stanislaus Co. Community Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

D. B.

Not Yet Classified

Central California Appellate Program

2150 River Plaza Dr., Ste. 300

Sacramento, CA 95833

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Office Of The County Counsel

1010 Tenth St., Ste. 6400

Modesto, CA 95354

Maria Elena Ratliff

Attorney at Stanislaus County Counsel

1010 Tenth St., Ste. 6400

Modesto, CA 95354

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Paul Adam Swiller

Attorney at Tot Law

1901 First Ave, Ste. 228

San Diego, CA 92101

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Central California Appellate Program

2150 River Plaza Dr., Ste. 300

Sacramento, CA 95833

 

Court Documents

F084230

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in part and remanded with directions; Disposition Type: Final The juvenile court's order terminating parental rights is conditionally affirmed. We remand for the agency and the juvenile court to comply with the inquiry and notice provisions of ICWA and California law. If the court finds the child is an Indian child, it shall conduct a new section 366.26 hearing, as well as all further proceedings, in compliance with ICWA and related California law. If not, the court's original section 366.26 order will remain in effect. Franson/Smith/Snauffer (4 pages); Publication Status: By the Court - Unpublished; Author: Snauffer, Mark W.; Participants: Smith, M. Bruce (Concur) Franson, Jr., Donald R. (Concur)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Forthwith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (By the Court - Unpublished) The juvenile court's order terminating parental rights is conditionally affirmed. We remand for the agency and the juvenile court to comply with the inquiry and notice provisions of ICWA and California law. If the court finds the child is an Indian child, it shall conduct a new section 366.26 hearing, as well as all further proceedings, in compliance with ICWA and related California law. If not, the court's original section 366.26 order will remain in effect. Franson/Smith/Snauffer (4 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: B.T.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation filed to:; Notes: ". . . an immediate remand to the Juvenile Court of Stanislaus County for purpose of conducting additional inquiry and providing notice under ICWA. . ."Saved to Juvenile Dependency Appeal folder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Delicia Bravo Attorney: Paul Adam Swiller Saved to the Brief and Juvenile Dependency folders.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Delicia BravoAttorney: Paul Adam Swiller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 07/01/2022 By 7 Day(s) 2nd request.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 07/01/2022 By 7 Day(s) 2nd request.Routed to SUPATTY via OnBase for review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 06/24/2022 By 18 Day(s) 1st Request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: AOB Due w/n 30 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R1/140 PagesPages 4-20 & 41-50 Intentionally Left Blank to Allow for Simultaneous Pagination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Confidential document filed*********; Notes: C1/20 Pages Pages 35-47, 684-690 of Clerk's Transcript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C3/759 PagesPages 35-47, 684-690 Filed Under Separate Cover

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed order appointing counsel (C.C.A.P. review).; Notes: Attorney Paul Adam Swiller Appointed obo Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Sent to Ctrrs Morrise, Rinne, Pfarr, McGee, Rueda and Eastman on 4/18/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: J366; Mother Appeals from the 4/12/22 Termination of Parental Rights and Denial of 388 Motion on 3/30/30; Copy to CCAP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Stanislaus County Superior Court - Main; County: Stanislaus; Trial Court Case Number: JVDP-21-000057; Trial Court Judge: Rees, Annette

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stanislaus Co. Community Services Agency is a litigant

Latest cases where Central California Appellate Program is a litigant