This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/20/2022 at 06:07:53 (UTC).

Stanislaus Co. Community Services Agency v. A.C.

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 Stanislaus Co Community Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against A C. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rees, Annette. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4189

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Rees, Annette

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Stanislaus Co. Community Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

A. C.

Not Yet Classified

Central California Appellate Program

2150 River Plaza Dr., Ste. 300

Sacramento, CA 95833

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Lindamarie S. GiacopuzziRotz

Attorney at Stanislaus County Community Services Agency

1010 10Th Street, Suite 6400

Modesto, CA 95354

Office Of The County Counsel

1010 Tenth St., Ste. 6400

Modesto, CA 95354

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Jacques Alexander Love

3053 Rancho Vista Blvd. #H200

Palmdale, CA 93551

Lauren Kelly Johnson

19200 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 600

Irvine, CA 92612

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Central California Appellate Program

2150 River Plaza Dr., Ste. 300

Sacramento, CA 95833

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Aplt Csl Love

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Conditional waiver filed by:; Notes: DCC GiacopuzziRotz - VC/15 Mins - September 9, 12; October 3, 14, 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: A. C. Attorney: Jacques Alexander Love

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: A. C.Attorney: Jacques Alexander Love

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Stanislaus Co. Community Services Agency Attorney: Lindamarie S. GiacopuzziRotz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Stanislaus Co. Community Services AgencyAttorney: Lindamarie S. GiacopuzziRotz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: A. C. Attorney: Jacques Alexander Love

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: A. C.Attorney: Jacques Alexander Love

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Superior Court, dated 4/25/22, confirming the Record on Appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: AOB due w/n 30 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R2/310; Pages 6-20 left blank due to block numbering of RT Vol.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Confidential document filed*********; Notes: C1/31 Pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C3/880 Pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed order appointing counsel (C.C.A.P. review).; Notes: Attorney Lauren Kelly Johnson Appointed obo Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Docket Sheet & Appeal Packet Sent to CCAP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Sent to Ctrrs Morrise, Pfarr, Soto, Vince-Olsen by Superior Ct on 4/5/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: J366; Mother Appeals 3/14/2022 Termination of Parental Rights; Copy to CCAP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Stanislaus County Superior Court - Main; County: Stanislaus; Trial Court Case Number: JVDP-20-000127; Trial Court Judge: Rees, Annette

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stanislaus Co. Community Services Agency is a litigant

Latest cases where Central California Appellate Program is a litigant