This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/15/2023 at 03:03:51 (UTC).

Stabbe v. The Superior Court of Orange County

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 Stabbe filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Orange County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCormick, Melissa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2183

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

McCormick, Melissa

 

Party Details

Petitioner

David Stabbe

Laguna Woods, CA 92637

Respondent

The Superior Court of Orange County

Attn: Hon. Melissa Mccormick 770 Civic Center Drive West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Party

Gregory Errol Chamitoff

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

John R. Wilkinson

2040 Main Street Ste 500

Irvine, CA 92614

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: E-filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate and request for immediate stay are DENIED. GOETHALS, ACTING P. J. * Before Goethals, Acting P. J., Sanchez, J., and Delaney, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Mailed ntc to petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Writ of Mandate By petitioner David Stabbe Immediate stay 1/11/2023 RECEIVED ON DEMANDPaper copy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case start date.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2022-01253043; Trial Court Judge: McCormick, Melissa

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less