This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/08/2022 at 03:27:15 (UTC).

Sprout Lending, LLC v. Javidzad et al.

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 Sprout Lending, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Javidzad. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sepe-Wiesenfeld, Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1188

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sepe-Wiesenfeld, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Sprout Lending, LLC

Hon. Lisa K. Sepe-Wiesenfeld

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Appellants and Defendants

Shahram Jeff Javidzad

Monica Nourman Javidzad

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Arnold L Graff

Attorney at Wright, Finlay & Zak

4665 Macarthur Court, Suite 20

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Kristina Marie Pelletier

Attorney at Wright Finlay Zak, LLP

4665 Macarthur Ct. Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Michael W. Vivoli

Attorney at Vivoli & Saccuzzo LLP

3104 Fourth Avenue

San Diego, CA 92103

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: File(s) returned to county clerk.; Notes: Appellate Division File: One volume in one Redweld folder(20SMUD00872, BV033552)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Transfer/certification denied; Disposition Type: Final It appearing that transfer of the above-entitled matter to this Court is not necessary (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.1002), the request for transfer, filed June 27, 2022, is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Transfer/certification denied.; Notes: It appearing that transfer of the above-entitled matter to this Court is not necessary (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.1002), the request for transfer, filed June 27, 2022, is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Memorandum to Supreme Court of California re recommendation to deny request for publication. [Filed July 5, 2022 in Superior Court]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: File(s) received from county clerk.; Notes: Appellate Division File: One volume in one Redweld folder(20SMUD00872, BV033552)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: M. Vivoli regarding appendix/record to be provided, and appellate division's orders.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: petitioners.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Non-compliance e-mail sent to appellant regarding missing Certificate of Interested Parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Re petition to transfer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition to transfer from appellate division filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIVOLI MICHAEL WARREN