This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/02/2023 at 03:10:10 (UTC).

Spielbauer Law Office v. Midland Funding LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 Spielbauer Law Office filed an Other lawsuit against Midland Funding LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Takaichi, Drew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0249

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Takaichi, Drew

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Spielbauer Law Office

Respondents and Defendants

Midland Funding LLC

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Spielbauer

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Thomas Arvizu

Thomas Fred Landers, Jr

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of Supreme Court filing.; Notes: Service Copy by Thomas Spielbauer - Reply to Answer to Petition for Review - No "Filed" stamp by The Supreme Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review received; Notes: Service Copy by Attorneys for Respondents, Midland Funding LLC and Midland Credit Managemen, Inc.- No "Filed" stamp by The Supreme Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: By Thomas Spielbauer - Filed in The Supreme Court on 4/3/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: By Thomas Spielbauer - No "Filed" stamp by The Supreme Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed by motion; Disposition Type: Final Respondents' motion to dismiss the appeal from the July 5, 2022, order entered after judgment is granted. The appeal is dismissed in its entirety. The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. (MJG, AMG, AMD)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Respondents' motion to dismiss the appeal from the July 5, 2022, order entered after judgment is granted. The appeal is dismissed in its entirety. The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. (MJG, AMG, AMD)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Rejected Appellant's request for extension of time to file opening brief because ruling on motion to dismiss is pending. No brief due at this time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Motion to dismiss appeal as the court has no power to hear the appeal filed by Thomas F. Landers obo respondent after the record was filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: AOB due in 40 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: RT-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Clerk's certificate of compliance.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Appellant's default notice: CRC 8.100 The $100 fee has not been deposited 8.100(b)(2).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Applt, order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Filed 7/29/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Spielbauer Law Office, filed 7/29/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: 18CV339157; Trial Court Judge: Takaichi, Drew

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less