This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/16/2023 at 20:02:09 (UTC).

SOULLIERE v. SUZUKI MOTOR CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 SOULLIERE filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against SUZUKI MOTOR CORPORATION. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4584

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Thomas Joseph Soulliere

Defendant and Appellant

Suzuki Motor Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Robert Terrence Simon

Attorney at The Simon Law Group, LLP

1327 North Broadway

Santa Ana, CA 92706

Troy Gabriel Houston

Attorney at Houston Law of California, PC

330 Main Street, Suite 203B

Seal Beach, CA 90740-6352

Travis Eugene Davis

Attorney at The Simon Law Group, LLP

1327 North Broadway

Santa Ana, CA 92706

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Lori A. Schweitzer

Attorney at BHC Law Group LLP

5900 Hollis Street, Suite O

Emeryville, CA 94608

Robert A. Brundage

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

1741 Technology Drive, Suite 200

San Jose, CA 95110-1364

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including August 12, 2022, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Suzuki Motor Corporation Attorney: Robert A. Brundage

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Three; Court of Appeal Case Number: G060951; Disposition: Dismissed by opinion; Trial Court: Orange County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2015-00790644

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less