This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/09/2022 at 14:22:31 (UTC).

SORENSEN v. TRAN

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 SORENSEN filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against TRAN. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0030

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant, Respondent and Plaintiff

Ann Sorensen

Not Yet Classified, Appellant and Defendant

Thu Dung Tran

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant, Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Jeffery Sutton

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/30/2021

DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: petition for review

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2021

DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Thu Dung Tran Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2021

DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Thu Dung Tran Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2021

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division One; Court of Appeal Case Number: D077620; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2016-00041963-CU-OR-CTL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less