This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/03/2022 at 03:02:26 (UTC).

Song v. The Weeks' Family Trust Dated August 15, 2017

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 Song filed an Other lawsuit against The Weeks' Family Trust Dated August 15, 2017. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7651

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Kit Song

Defendant and Appellant

Mari Anne Swartwood

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Edward Ji Chong

Attorney at Law Offices of Edward J. Chong & Associates

3325 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 1250

Los Angeles, CA 90010

James L. Reynolds

Attorney at James Lee Reynolds, Esq.,

269 South Beverly Drive, #625

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Benjamin Beau Berger

Attorney at Berger Harrison, APC,

114 Pacifica Ste 470

Irvine, CA 92618

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(c), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed December 30, 2021, is dismissed. In addition the Court notes that appellant has also failed to file a Case Information Statement. (2DCA/APP-004)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (December 30, 2021 by Mari Anne Swartwood ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Jan. 14, 2022: The appellant in this case has not been granted a waiver of the fees for preparing a clerk's transcript. I elect under rule 8.124(a) to use an appendix in lieu of a clerk's transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Jan. 10, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on December 30, 2021 by Mari Anne Swartwood

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19LBCV00493

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less