This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/21/2021 at 12:53:37 (UTC).

Solorio v. Wilson & Kratezer Mortuaries et al.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Solorio filed an Other lawsuit against Wilson Kratezer Mortuaries. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Baskin, Barry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2389

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Baskin, Barry

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Lynette Solorio

Respondents and Defendants

Yen Tom

Wilson & Kratezer Mortuaries

Misty Lynn Cicerello

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan Charles Dell'Ario

P.O.Box 359

Napa, CA 94559

Bradley Landis Bostick

Attorney at Mediation and Law Office of Bradley Bostick

1300 Clay Street Suite 600

Oakland, CA 94612

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Constance J. Yu

Attorney at Putterman Landry + Yu LLP

345 California Street, Suite 1160

San Francisco, CA 94104

Josh Daniel Friedman

Attorney at Collins Collins Muir + Stewart

1999 Harrison St Ste 1700

Oakland, CA 94612-4727

James C Jardin

Attorney at Collins Collins Muir Stewart LLP

1999 Harrison Street, Suite 1700

Oakland, CA 94612

Edward Joseph Riffle

Attorney at Collins & Collins

790 E. Colorado Blvd; Suite 600

Pasadena, CA 91101

Christian E Nagy

Attorney at Collins & Collins

790 E. Colorado Blvd; Suite 600

Pasadena, CA 91101

Nadim Gamal Hegazi

Attorney at Collins Collins Muir + Stewart LLP

1999 Harrison St Ste 1700

Oakland, CA 94612-4727

Michael Robert Welch

Attorney at Philip M. Andersen & Associates

6210 Stoneridge Mall Road, Suite 550

Pleasanton, CA 94588

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT: Appellant having filed a request for dismissal of appeal in this court, the appeal is dismissed and the remittitur is to issue forthwith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: Appellant having filed a request for dismissal of appeal in this court, the appeal is dismissed and the remittitur is to issue forthwith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Alan Charles Dell'Ario for appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Lynette Solorio Attorney: Bradley Landis Bostick

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Lynette Solorio Attorney: Bradley Landis Bostick with order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Lynette SolorioAttorney: Bradley Landis Bostick; Notes: with order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-1(attached to designation)(e-filed) **ENTIRE RECORD ELECTRONIC**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 04/14/2021. Designating 8.124 with RT(attached).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 15046, One Hour Delivery Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 04/05/2021 by Counsel for Plaintiff Lynette Solorio appealing judgment from 02/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Contra Costa County Superior Court - Main; County: Contra Costa; Trial Court Case Number: MSC1901329; Trial Court Judge: Baskin, Barry

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wilson & Kratezer Mortuaries is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan Charles Dell'Ario

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOSTICK, BRADLEY L.