This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/31/2022 at 14:00:35 (UTC).

Solano County Public Defender et al. v. Superior Court for the County of Solano

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 Solano County Public Defender filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the County of Solano. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gutierrez, Carlos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5131

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Gutierrez, Carlos

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Solano County Public Defender

Demark Anthony Bernstine, Jr.

Respondent

Superior Court for the County of Solano

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Elena Marie D'Agustino

Attorney at Office of Solano County Public Defender

675 Texas Street, Suite 3500

Fairfield, CA 94533

Tehanita Tamani Taylor

Attorney at Solano County Public Defender

675 Texas Street, Suite 3500

Fairfield, CA 94533

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Office of District Attorney

Hall Of Justice 675 Texas Street 4Th Floor

Fairfield, CA 94533

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT:* Petitioner seeks writ relief regarding respondent superior court's April 29, 2022 order denying petitioner's "Ex Parte Request for Copy of Sealed Recording of Proceedings etc." The petition's exhibits do not include any response to petitioner's ex parte application or a record of any hearing on that application, and the petition does not indicate whether those record materials exist. (Sherwood v. Superior Court (1979) 24 Cal.3d 183, 186-187; Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b)(1)(B) & (D), (b)(3).) Furthermore, in this court, petitioner cites additional authority not initially presented to the superior court in the ex parte application. Finally, petitioner possesses another adequate remedy at law by way of the noticed motion process in the superior court. Accordingly, the petition for writ of mandate is denied without prejudice to petitioner filing a noticed motion in the superior court. In the event petitioner again seeks writ relief from this court, the petition shall provide an adequate record, and identify or otherwise address the "real party in interest" to the writ proceeding. (See Sonoma County Nuclear Free Zone '86 v. Superior Court (1987) 189 Cal.App.3d 167, 173.) * Before Simons, Acting P.J., and Needham, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT:* Petitioner seeks writ relief regarding respondent superior court's April 29, 2022 order denying petitioner's "Ex Parte Request for Copy of Sealed Recording of Proceedings etc." The petition's exhibits do not include any response to petitioner's ex parte application or a record of any hearing on that application, and the petition does not indicate whether those record materials exist. (Sherwood v. Superior Court (1979) 24 Cal.3d 183, 186-187; Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b)(1)(B) & (D), (b)(3).) Furthermore, in this court, petitioner cites additional authority not initially presented to the superior court in the ex parte application. Finally, petitioner possesses another adequate remedy at law by way of the noticed motion process in the superior court. Accordingly, the petition for writ of mandate is denied without prejudice to petitioner filing a noticed motion in the superior court. In the event petitioner again seeks writ relief from this court, the petition shall provide an adequate record, and identify or otherwise address the "real party in interest" to the writ proceeding. (See Sonoma County Nuclear Free Zone '86 v. Superior Court (1987) 189 Cal.App.3d 167, 173.) * Before Simons, Acting P.J., and Needham, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: MandateExhibits 1 - 4 included

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Solano County Superior Court - Main; County: Solano; Trial Court Case Number: VCR238059; Trial Court Judge: Gutierrez, Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court for the County of Solano is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant