This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/03/2021 at 02:34:26 (UTC).

Solano County Health and Social Services Department v. S.M. et al.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 Solano County Health and Social Services Department filed an Other lawsuit against M. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ellis, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3273

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ellis, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Solano County Health and Social Services Department

Appellants and Defendants

S. M.

L. C.

Not Yet Classified, Appellant and Defendant

L. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office of Solano County Counsel

675 Texas Street - Suite 6600

Fairfield, CA 94533

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Leslie Barry

650 Park Road

Mays Landing, NJ 08330

First District Appellate Project

Attorney at First District Appellate Project

475 Fourteenth Street, Suite 650

Oakland, CA 94612

Linda Sue Rehm

P.O. Box 9937

Brea, CA 92822

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Record Filed AOB Due in 30 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-10,-1 Clerk's Transcript filed through TAP Reporter's Transcript attached and in the P Drive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: Clerk's Transcript Vol 1-2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Appellant S.M. in support of appointment of counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Leslie Barry for appellant S.M. (Independent/30)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Linda Rehm for appellant L.C. (Independent/30)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed on 8/12/21 by Defendant L.C. (Father)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed on 8/10/21 by Defendant S.M. (Mother)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: *****FAST TRACK APPEAL*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Solano County Superior Court - Main; County: Solano; Trial Court Case Number: J44721; Trial Court Judge: Ellis, John

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Solano County Health and Social Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda S. Rehm

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leslie A. Barry