This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/12/2022 at 14:35:29 (UTC).

Soberanis v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Soberanis filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6562

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Frank Soberanis

Lancaster, CA 93539-8457

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Presiding Judge

Los Angeles Superior Court 210 W Temple St

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate and stay request filed November 24, 2021, as well as the supplement filed December 6, 2021. The petition is denied in its entirety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: supplemental to 11/24/21 writ petition filed by Frank Soberanis; dated 11/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate with a STAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant