This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/15/2022 at 18:05:21 (UTC).

Sn v. The Superior Court of Orange County

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Sn filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Orange County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Howard, Theodore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1047

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Howard, Theodore

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sharmila Sn

Irvine, CA 92620

Respondent

The Superior Court of Orange County

Hon. Theodore Howard Dept. C-18 700 Civic Center Drive West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Party

Girish Kannalli

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

Salvatore Nicholas Padula

Attorney at Boyd Law

2029 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: ALL documents scanned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for a writ of mandate and request for immediate stay are DENIED. Petitioner's third application for a fee waiver is DENIED as MOOT. O'LEARY, P. J. * Before O'Leary, P. J., Fybel, J., and Goethals, J.Order called in.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Showing service to Superior Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Fee waiver request denied.; Notes: Petitioner's second application for a fee waiver or fee payment plan is DENIED without prejudice. Petitioner did not complete all sections of the application and the information petitioner provided does not show whether there are sufficient funds to pay the filing fee promptly without using money that normally would pay for the common necessaries of life for petitioner and petitioner's family. (Gov. Code, 68632, subd. (c), 68634.5, subd. (b).) In particular, petitioner did not complete sections 8a and 8b of the application asking for gross monthly income and total monthly income. Section 8a lines 1 through 4 should list income, if any, while section 11 asks for monthly deductions and expenses, if any. Petitioner shall either refile a completed form or pay the applicable filing fee within 10 days of the date of this order or the petition will be dismissed for failure to pay the appropriate fees. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.26(f).)Copy of order mailed to petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: 2nd application filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Fee waiver request denied.; Notes: Petitioner's application for a fee waiver or fee payment plan is DENIED without prejudice. Petitioner did not complete all sections of the application and the information petitioner provided does not show whether there are sufficient funds to pay the filing fee promptly without using money that normally would pay for the common necessaries of life for petitioner and petitioner's family. (Gov. Code, 68632, subd. (c), 68634.5, subd. (b).) Petitioner shall either refile a completed form or pay the applicable filing fee within 10 days of the date of this order or the petition will be dismissed for failure to pay the appropriate fees. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.26(f).)copy of order mailed to petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Flash drive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: by petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: mandate by petitioner Sharmila Sn

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant