This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/02/2022 at 00:53:44 (UTC).

Smith v. The Superior Court of San Diego County/The People

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 Smith filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of San Diego County/The People. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Thompson, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0366

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Thompson, John

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Marquell Dion Smith

Respondent

The Superior Court of San Diego County

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Gilson Berryman Gray

Attorney at San Diego Public Defender

450 B St Ste 1200

San Diego, CA 92101-8004

Interested Party Attorneys

Kristian Paul Trocha

Attorney at District Attorney San Diego County

330 W Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Office of the Attorney General

P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Office Of The District Attorney

Appellate Division P. O. Box X-1011

San Diego, CA 92112

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate and informal response have been read and considered by Justices Huffman, Irion, and Dato. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate and informal response have been read and considered by Justices Huffman, Irion, and Dato. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Informal response filed by:; Notes: Real Party in Interest: The People Attorney: Office of the Attorney General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketBrief: Informal response filed by:; Party Attorney: Real Party in Interest: The PeopleAttorney: Office of the Attorney General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: The District Attorney is requested to file an informal response to the petition on or before May 26, 2022, no later than 3:00 p.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of San Diego County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant