This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/15/2023 at 02:07:55 (UTC).

Smith v. Lang et al.

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 Smith filed an Other lawsuit against Lang. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ford III, Harry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1750

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ford III, Harry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Nailah Smith

Respondent and Defendant

Ronald Lang

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Suzanne Elizabeth Rand-Lewis

Attorney at Gary Rand & Suzanne E. Rand-Lewis PLC

5758 Halbrent Avenue

Sherman Oaks, CA 91411

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Terrence J. Schafer

Attorney at Doyle, Schafer & McMahon, LLP

5440 Trabuco Road

Irvine, CA 92620

Emily C. Vogt

Attorney at Doyle Schafer McMahon, LLP

5440 Trabuco Road

Irvine, CA 92620

David Zee Sohn

Attorney at Cole Pedroza LLP

2295 Huntington Drive

San Marino, CA 91108

Kenneth R. Pedroza

Attorney at Cole Pedroza LLP

2295 Huntington Dr

San Marino, CA 91108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Nailah Smith Attorney: Suzanne Elizabeth Rand-Lewis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: [ One volume ]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 04/10/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Ronald LangAttorney: David Zee Sohn Attorney: Emily C. Vogt Attorney: Kenneth R. Pedroza Attorney: Terrence J. Schafer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Nailah SmithAttorney: Suzanne Elizabeth Rand-Lewis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Appellant's notice of change of address.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Nailah Smith Attorney: Suzanne Elizabeth Rand-Lewis Notice of appeal filed June 13, 2022 by Nailah Smith. (U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Nailah SmithAttorney: Suzanne Elizabeth Rand-Lewis; Notes: Notice of appeal filed June 13, 2022 by Nailah Smith. (U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant's $775 filing fee paid via credit card.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: It appearing that through inadvertence and mistake on August 18, 2022, this court dismissed the above-entitled appeal under Rule 8.100(g), for the appeal filed June 13, 2022. Now, therefore, it is ordered that the dismissal filed August 18, 2022, is vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(c), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed June 13, 2022, is dismissed. In addition the Court notes that appellant has also failed to file a Case Information Statement. (2DCA/APP-004)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (June 13, 2022 by Nailah Smith (U1) ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Appellant's civil filing fee ($775)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed June 13, 2022 by Nailah Smith. (U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC712013; Trial Court Judge: Ford III, Harry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less