This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/05/2023 at 01:21:15 (UTC).

Smith v. Olympia Healthcare, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 Smith filed an Other lawsuit against Olympia Healthcare, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ford III, Harry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8987

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ford III, Harry

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Nailah Smith

Defendants and Respondents

Olympia Healthcare, LLC

Alecto Healthcare Services Los Angeles, LLC

Christos Kalatzis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Suzanne Elizabeth Rand-Lewis

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Deborah S. Tropp

David P. Pruett

Kenneth R. Pedroza

Alexandra Josephine Muehl

Thomas F. McAndrews

Elizabeth Ann Neri

David Zee Sohn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • HearingDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Appellant's response to this court's notice sent April 14, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The civil case information statement for the (U) appeal filed February 25, 2022 was received and filed on April 4, 2022. However, the order attached to the civil case information statement is not a final judgment entered after an order granting summary judgment and is therefore nonappealable. (Code Civ. Proc., 437c, subd. (m)(1); Levy v. Skywalker Sound (2003) 108 Cal.App.4th 753, 761, fn. 7; Stolz v. Wong Communications Limited Partnership (1994) 25 Cal.App.4th 1811, 1816.) Please provide the court with an appealable judgment within 15 days of the date of this notice with proof of service on opposing party(ies). (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 8.25(a)(1)-(2).) If no final judgment has been entered, then you are requested to demonstrate in writing why the appeal should not be dismissed as having been taken from a nonappealable order. Failure to provide an appealable judgment or file a response within the time provided may result in the appeal being dismissed without further notice. (Sherman v. Standard Mines Co. (1913) 166 Cal. 524, 525.) (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: David Sohn of Cole Pedroza is associated in as counsel of record for respondent Christos Kalatzis, M.D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 filing fee paid. (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Nailah Smith Attorney: Suzanne Elizabeth Rand-Lewis (R1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Nailah Smith Attorney: Suzanne Elizabeth Rand-Lewis (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Nailah SmithAttorney: Suzanne Elizabeth Rand-Lewis; Notes: (R1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Nailah SmithAttorney: Suzanne Elizabeth Rand-Lewis; Notes: (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (February 25, 2022 by Nailah Smith (U) ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Timothy Rand-Lewis.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received (R1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on February 25, 2022 by Nailah Smith (R1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on February 25, 2022 by Nailah Smith(U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC712013; Trial Court Judge: Ford III, Harry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less