This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 05/03/2021 at 03:26:00 (UTC).

Smith v. Costco Wholesale

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 Smith filed an Other lawsuit against Costco Wholesale. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Grillo, Evelio. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1147

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Grillo, Evelio

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Charles E. Smith

Berkeley, CA 94702

Defendant and Respondent

Costco Wholesale

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

David Torosyan

Attorney at Severson & Werson APC

One Embarcadero Center Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Sharon C. Collier

Attorney at Severson & Werson APC

One Embarcadero Center Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jordan Michael Meeks

Attorney at Severson & Werson

1 Embarcadero Ctr Ste 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111-3715

Jan T. Chilton

Attorney at Severson & Werson

One Embarcadero Center, Suite. 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111-3600

Kerry William Franich

Attorney at Severson & Werson

19100 Von Karman Ave., Suite 700

Irvine, CA 92612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Dear Mr. Smith: The court is returning your application for extension of time to file brief. The court dismissed the appeal on November 30, 2020, which was served by first-class mail on the same date. The remittitur was issued on February 3, 2021, which returns jurisdiction to the superior court. The remittitur was also served by first-class mail on the date it was issued. Enclosed are copies of the dismissal order and the remittitur.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: application for extension of time to file brief from appellant Charles Smith in pro. per.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final Charles E. Smith purports to appeal from an August 4, 2020, order filed in the Alameda County superior court. The Civil Case Information Statement appellant has filed concedes notice of entry of the August 4, 2020, order was served on August 5, 2020. Therefore, under California Rules of Court, rule 8.104(a)(1)(A) and (a)(1)(B), appellant had 60 days from that date i.e. October 5, 2020, to file his notice of appeal. Appellant's notice, filed on October 8, 2020 was too late. Dismissal is mandatory. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.104(b).) The appeal is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Charles E. Smith purports to appeal from an August 4, 2020, order filed in the Alameda County superior court. The Civil Case Information Statement appellant has filed concedes notice of entry of the August 4, 2020, order was served on August 5, 2020. Therefore, under California Rules of Court, rule 8.104(a)(1)(A) and (a)(1)(B), appellant had 60 days from that date i.e. October 5, 2020, to file his notice of appeal. Appellant's notice, filed on October 8, 2020 was too late. Dismissal is mandatory. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.104(b).) The appeal is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Charles E. Smith Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Charles E. SmithPro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: attorney Kerry Franich dated Nov. 4, 2020 re counsel of record for respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 10/08/2020 by Plaintiff Charles E. Smith in propria persona appealing judgment from 08/11/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG19010789; Trial Court Judge: Grillo, Evelio

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANICH KERRY W.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jan T. Chilton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEEKS JORDAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLLIER, SHARON C.