This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/02/2022 at 04:08:33 (UTC).

Smith et al. v. MV Transportation, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 Smith filed an Other lawsuit against MV Transportation, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Czuleger, J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9588

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Czuleger, J.

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Barry Smith

Rose Smith

Appellant and Defendant

MV Transportation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Isaac Ehrlich

Attorney at The Ehrlich Law Firm

237 West Fourth Street Second Floor

Claremont, CA 91711

Garo Mardirossian

Attorney at Mardirossian & Associates

6311 Wilshire Blvd., Third Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90048-5001

Lawrence D. Marks

Attorney at Mardirossian and Associates, Inc.

6311 Wilshire Blvd. 3Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90048-5001

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Robert H. Wright

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy

3601 W Olive Ave 8Th Floor

Burbank, CA 91505-4681

Steven S. Fleischman

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy LLP

3601 West Olive Ave. 8Th Floor

Burbank, CA 91505-4681

Justin R. Wilmers

Attorney at Poole Shaffery & Koegle, LLP

25350 Magic Mountain Pkwy. 2Nd Floor

Valencia, CA 91355

David Sean Poole

Attorney at Poole Shaffery & Koegle LLP

25350 Magic Mountain Pkwy, Ste 250

Santa Clarita, CA 91355-1184

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: June 15, 2022 as to designation of record and Reporter's Transcript fees.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated March 25, 2022: The appellant in this case has not been granted a waiver of the fees for preparing a clerk's transcript. I elect under rule 8.124(a) to use an appendix in lieu of a clerk's transcript.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: MV Transportation, Inc. Attorney: David Sean Poole

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: The Law Firm of Poole Shaffery associates the firm Horvitz & Levy as co-counsel of record for Appellant MV Transportation, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: MV Transportation, Inc.Attorney: David Sean Poole

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check# 1036849 for $775.00 (Legal Support Network, LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 3/17/2022 by MV Transportation, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC680763; Trial Court Judge: Czuleger, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MV TRANSPORTATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert H. Wright

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Samuel Fleischman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POOLE, DAVID S