This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/19/2022 at 01:13:46 (UTC).

Smith et al. v. Meneghetti et al.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 Smith filed an Other lawsuit against Meneghetti. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Randle, Murlene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3465

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Randle, Murlene

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

James Smith

San Francisco, CA 94123

Mihaela Pucko

San Francisco, CA 94123

Michela Pucko

San Francisco, CA 94123

Appellants and Defendants

Tony Meneghetti

Shelli Meneghetti

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Sharon M. Nagle

Attorney at Bold, Polisner, Maddow, Nelson & Judson

2125 Oak Gorve Road, Suite 210

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's reply brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: James Smith Pro Per Plaintiff and Respondent: Michela Pucko Pro Per Filed by both respondents.One extension granted for a total of 45 days: 04/18/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 06/06/2022 By 45 Day(s) 04/18/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 06/06/2022 By 45 Day(s) Stipulated on 3/7/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Due Date: 06/29/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Tony MeneghettiAttorney: Sharon M. Nagle Defendant and Appellant: Shelli Meneghetti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: James SmithPro Per Plaintiff and Respondent: Michela PuckoPro Per; Notes: Filed by both respondents.One extension granted for a total of 45 days: 04/18/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 06/06/2022 By 45 Day(s) 04/18/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 06/06/2022 By 45 Day(s) Stipulated on 3/7/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent rescinding 8.220(a) notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: James Smith Pro Per Plaintiff and Respondent: Michela Pucko Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: James SmithPro Per Plaintiff and Respondent: Michela PuckoPro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Respondent's brief stipulated to 4/22/22

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Appellant's Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Tony Meneghetti Attorney: Sharon M. Nagle Order attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Tony MeneghettiAttorney: Sharon M. Nagle; Notes: Order attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: pd; R156511;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-1(e-filed)(attached to designation) **Entire Record Electronic**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 09/01/2021. Designating 8.124 with RT(attached).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 08/20/2021 by Counsel for Defendants Tony and Shelli Meneghetti appealing order from 07/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CCH21583694; Trial Court Judge: Randle, Murlene

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAGLE, SHARON M.