This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 09/13/2021 at 22:48:46 (UTC).

Smalley v. Subaru of America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Smalley filed an Other lawsuit against Subaru of America, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Margines, Charles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0441

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Margines, Charles

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Michael Smalley

Respondent and Defendant

Subaru of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Payam Shahian

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices, APC

1840 Century Park E Ste 430

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Hallen David Rosner

Attorney at Rosner Barry & Babbitt, LLP

10085 Carroll Cyn Rd Ste 100

San Diego, CA 92131

Arlyn L Escalante

Attorney at Rosner, Barry & Babbitt, LLP

10085 Carroll Canyon Rd Ste 100

San Diego, CA 92131

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Ryan Peter Ruggerello

Attorney at Ruggerello Law Group LLP

19800 Macarthur Blvd, Ste 650

Irvine, CA 92612

Kristan Louise Ruggerello

Attorney at Ruggerello Law Group LLP

19800 Macarthur Blvd Ste 650

Irvine, CA 92612

James Stephen Azadian

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLC

333 S Grand Ave Ste 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: 1-RT (1-4 pages) AAO is now due on 09/27/2021 in the consolidated lead record G059004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: 1RT (pages 1-4) hearing date of May 5, 2021 returned back to Superior Court attention of Adriana Court Reporter's Manager. Case caption on RT does not match COA caption. RT caption states Michael Smalley v. Subaru of America, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive. Also COA case numbers are listed incorrectly. RT states G060411 and G09904.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid by APLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed order consolidating with case:; Notes: Appellant's unopposed motion to consolidate is GRANTED. The appeals in case numbers G059904 and G060441 are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes, including briefing, oral argument, and decision. Case number G059904 shall be the lead case number and all filings shall include both case numbers. Appellant elected to utilize an appendix and designated a reporter's transcript in both cases. (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124.) In case number G059904, the reporter's transcript was filed on April 7, 2021. The reporter's transcript in case number G060441 remains due. Appellant shall serve and file its consolidated appellant's opening brief and appendix within 40 days after the reporter's transcript for case number G060441 is filed. Respondent shall serve and file a consolidated respondent's brief within 30 days after appellant's opening brief is filed. Appellant may serve and file a consolidated reply brief within 20 days after the consolidated respondent's brief is filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR David Salyer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 06/30/21 (8.124 w/RT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appellant: Michael Smalley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2017-00901612; Trial Court Judge: Margines, Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Stephen Azadian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUGGERELLO KRISTAN LOUISE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUGGERELLO RYAN