This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/05/2022 at 04:02:00 (UTC).

SLO County Citizens for Good Government, Inc. et al. v. County of San Luis Obispo et al.

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 SLO County Citizens for Good Government, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against County of San Luis Obispo. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Federman, Rita. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8367

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Federman, Rita

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Appellants

SLO County Citizens for Good Government, Inc.

Patricia Gomez

Don Maruska

Allene Villa

Respondents

County of San Luis Obispo

Board of Supervisors of San Luis Obispo County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Appellant Attorney

Ellison Folk

Attorney at Shute, Mihaly & Weinberger

396 Hayes Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Respondent Attorney

Jeffrey V. Dunn

Attorney at Best, Best & Krieger LLP

18101 Von Karman Ave. - #1000

Irvine, CA 92612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final Filed in trial court on 2/24/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dtd 2-10-22 by SLO County Citizens for Good Government, Inc. et al.; from 2-9-22 order under Code of Civil Procedure 904.1(a)(3)-(13)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Luis Obispo County Superior Court - Main (SLO Court 1); County: San Luis Obispo; Trial Court Case Number: 22CVP-0007; Trial Court Judge: Federman, Rita

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less