This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/26/2022 at 22:00:24 (UTC).

SLACK v. MARX

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 SLACK filed an Other lawsuit against MARX. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2575

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Elizabeth Anne Slack

Respondents and Defendants

Paul Marx

David Garibaldi

Rutan & Tucker, LLP

Not Yet Classified

Association of Southern California Defense Counsel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Jared Victor Walder

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Courtney Elizabeth Curtis

Andrew J. Waxler

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Shannon Edward Mader

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Association of Southern California Defense Counsel Attorney: Shannon Edward Mader Per Court of Appeal order of 1/4/2022: ".... Our opinion follows established law and does not meet the standards set forth in California Rules of Court, rule 8.1105(c)."

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Three; Court of Appeal Case Number: G059600; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Orange County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2018-01007078

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less