This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/29/2022 at 19:10:34 (UTC).

Skyler A. Womack, by and Through His Succesor-In-Interest, Jonie A. Holland v. Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 Skyler A Womack, by and Through His Succesor-In-Interest, Jonie A Holland filed an Other lawsuit against Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Court, Michelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3237

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Court, Michelle

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Skyler A. Womack, by and Through His Succesor-In-Interest, Jonie A. Holland

Appellant and Defendant

Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven Charles Peck

Attorney at Peck Law Group, APC

6454 Van Nuys Blvd #150

Van Nuys, CA 91401

Adam Joshua Peck

Attorney at The Peck Law Group

6454 Van Nuys Blvd. Suite 150

Van Nuys, CA 91401-1407

Spencer Eliot Peck

Attorney at Peck Law Group, APC

6454 Van Nuys Blvd Ste 150

Van Nuys, CA 91401-1407

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Tracy Diana Forbath

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101-8198

Kathleen M. Walker

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Sept. 15, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #402036 for $775 from lasc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc. Attorney: Kathleen M. Walker Attorney: Tracy Diana Forbath

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 01/03/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc.Attorney: Kathleen M. Walker Attorney: Tracy Diana Forbath

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc.Attorney: Kathleen M. Walker Attorney: Tracy Diana Forbath

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on September 06, 2022 by Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 22STCV01945; Trial Court Judge: Court, Michelle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tracy Diana Forbath

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALKER KATHLEEN M. ESQ.