This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/23/2022 at 11:52:37 (UTC).

Skull Base Medical Group, Inc. et al. v. Mallo

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 Skull Base Medical Group, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Mallo. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alarcon, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7082

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Alarcon, Gregory

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Skull Base Institute

Skull Base Medical Group, Inc.

Defendant and Appellant

Thomas Mallo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Tappan Zee

Attorney at Zee Law Group, P.C.

9660 Telstar Avenue

El Monte, CA 91731-3339

Kimberly Sue Navarro Barrientos

Attorney at Zee Law Group, P.C.

9660 Telstar Ave.

El Monte, CA 91731

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Joseph J. M. Lange

Attorney at Joseph J. M. Lange Law Corporation

222 N. Sepulveda Blvd. Suite 2000

El Segundo, CA 90245

 

Court Documents

B287082

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DispositionDescription: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Disposition Type: Final The judgment is reversed. The trial court is directed to enter a judgment in favor of Mallo. Mallo is awarded his costs on appeal. 12 pgs.; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Johnson, Jeffrey W.; Participants: Currey, Brian S. (Concur) Rothschild, Frances (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The judgment is reversed. The trial court is directed to enter a judgment in favor of Mallo. Mallo is awarded his costs on appeal. 12 pgs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketDescription: Telephone conversation with:; Notes: Attorney Barrientos for respondents, requesting 5 min. for oral argument.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Joseph J.M. Lange for appellant Thomas Mallo.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent. Calendar date:; Notes: Wednesday, November 14, 2018 at 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Thomas Mallo Attorney: Joseph J. M. Lange

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Appellant Mallo substitutes out Kenneth E. Lange and substitutes in Joseph J.M. Lange as counsel of record.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Thomas Mallo Attorney: Kenneth Eugene Lange

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Thomas MalloAttorney: Kenneth Eugene Lange

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #108774 for $775

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed 12/19/17 by Thomas Mallo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC603023; Trial Court Judge: Alarcon, Gregory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SKULL BASE MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANGE, JOSEPH J.M.