This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/02/2022 at 01:07:09 (UTC).

Sinco Technologies PTE LTD v. Xinge Electronics CO. LTD et al.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 Sinco Technologies PTE LTD filed an Other lawsuit against Xinge Electronics CO LTD. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucas, Patricia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8728

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lucas, Patricia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Sinco Technologies PTE LTD

Defendants and Respondents

Xinge Electronics CO. LTD

Quek Seow Eng

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Lael David Andara

Attorney at Ropers Majeski Kohn & Bentley

545 Middlefield Road, Suite 175

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Terry Anastassiou

Attorney at Ropers, Majeski, Kohn & Bentley

545 Middlefield Road, Suite 175,

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Todd A. Roberts

Attorney at Ropers, Majeski, Kohn & Bentley

545 Middlefield Road, Suite 175

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Jeffrey Chengpang Wang

Attorney at WHGC PLC

1301 Dove St Ste 1050

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Edwin Ken Prather

Attorney at Prather Law Offices

245 5Th St Ste 103

San Francisco, CA 94103-4190

Jeffrey L. Fazio

Attorney at Micheletti LLP

1111 Broadway, Ste 400

Oakland, CA 94607

Michael Gordon York

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael G. York

1301 Dove St #1000

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Kirk Christophe Jenkins

Attorney at Sedgwick LLP

1 N Wacker Dr Ste 4200

Chicago, IL 60606-2807

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final The parties' stipulated request for dismissal is granted. The appeal filed on December 28, 2020 is dismissed. The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. The remittitur shall issue forthwith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: The parties' stipulated request for dismissal is granted. The appeal filed on December 28, 2020 is dismissed. The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. The remittitur shall issue forthwith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Follow up letter re : Stipulation for dismissal with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation filed to:; Notes: Stipulation for dismissal with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Xinge Electronics CO. LTD did not file brief or request for extension of time by 4/14/22 due date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: BY THE COURT: Good cause having been shown, Respondent's request for an extension of time to file respondent's brief is granted to May 15, 2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: 1st

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: 29 days for AAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: Reporter's transcript filed, AOB due in 40 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: RT-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: RT attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Sinco Technologies PTE LTD, Filed 12/28/20

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sinco Technologies PTE LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terry P. Anastassiou