This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/23/2021 at 12:39:59 (UTC).

Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc. et al. v. Trinity Risk Management, LLC. et al.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2019 Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Trinity Risk Management, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fujie, Holly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7176

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fujie, Holly

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Ashish Wahi

Simplified Staffing Labors Solutions, LLC.

Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc.

Michael Dougan

Appellants and Defendants

Trinity Risk Management, LLC.

Harold J. Knight

Knight Management Group, Inc.

Michel Powers

Labornow, Inc.

Sam Delois

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

John Richardson Walton

35 N. Lake Avenue Suite 700

Pasadena, CA 91101

Clayton J Hix

Attorney at Hill, Farrer & Burrill LLP

300 S Grand Ave 37Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ali Zamin Vaqar

Attorney at Walton Law Group, P.C.

35 N. Lake Avenue Suite 700

Pasadena, CA 91101

Rodney Scott Lasher

Attorney at Hill, Farrer & Burrill LLP

300 S Grand Ave Fl 37

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3147

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Donald S. Burris

Attorney at Burris, Shoenberg & Walden LLP

12121 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Clarissa Rodriguez

 

Court Documents

B297176

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review is denied. [S267230]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: S267230

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order granting publication filed.; Notes: The opinion in the above-entitled matter filed on January 11, 2021, was not certified for publication in the Official Reports. For good cause, it now appears that the opinion should be published in the Official Reports and it is so ordered. There is no change in the judgment. Grimes-Stratton-Wiley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed request to publish opinion.; Notes: Gates Eisenhart Dawson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final; Publication Status: Ordered Published; Author: Stratton, Maria E.; Participants: Wiley Jr., John Shepard (Concur) Grimes, Elizabeth A. (Concur)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Published) Affirmed/Stratton-Grimes-Wiley/20pgs.Ordered published per court's 01/14/2021 order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Permission to file the Appellants' new authority received on October 28, 2020 is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated May 28, 2019: 8.122 w. RT - (R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Partial April 22, 2019: Trinity Risk Management, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: April 22, 2019: Trinity Risk Management, LLC.It appearing that the appellant: Trinity Risk Management, LLC. is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(c), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed April 22, 2019, is dismissed. In addition the Court notes that appellant has also failed to file a Case Information Statement. (2DCA/APP-004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Trinity Risk Management, LLC. Attorney: Donald S. Burris "R"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Trinity Risk Management, LLC.Attorney: Donald S. Burris; Notes: "R"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: April 22, 2019: Trinity Risk Management, LLC "R"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No Fee Rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: April 22, 2019: Trinity Risk Management, LLC "R"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: April 22, 2019: Trinity Risk Management, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC709369; Trial Court Judge: Fujie, Holly

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIMPLIFIED STAFFING LABOR SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SIMPLIFIED LABOR STAFFING SOLUTIONS INC. is a litigant