This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/15/2022 at 01:10:31 (UTC).

Simonyans v. Torbati

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 Simonyans filed an Other lawsuit against Torbati. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Moreton, Jr., Edward. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4013

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Moreton, Jr., Edward

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Rita Simonyans

Respondent and Defendant

Kamran Torbati

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Louis F. Teran

Attorney at SLC Law Group

1055 E. Colorado Blvd. Suite 500

Pasadena, CA 91106

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Denise H. Greer

Attorney at Schmid & Voiles

333 So. Hope Street, 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1409

Bradley Charles Clark

Attorney at Schmid & Voiles

333 S. Hope Street 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Aug. 26, 2021: 8.122 w. RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On August 31, 2021, the clerk received and filed appellant Rita Simonyans's response to the clerk's August 20, 2021 notice requesting Simonyans to provide the final, appealable judgment entered after the order granting summary judgment. In her response, Simonyans indicates that no final judgment has been entered in this case but that the order granting summary judgment ended the litigation and effectively resulted in a dismissal of the case. The determination of whether there exists sufficient finality in the appealed order granting summary judgment is deferred to the panel in the division that will hear the appeal. The clerk's August 20, 2021 notice is hereby discharged.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Appellant's response to Court's August 20, 2021 notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The civil case information statement for the appeal filed July 2, 2021 was received and filed on August 16, 2021. However, the order attached to the civil case information statement is not a final judgment entered after an order granting summary judgment and is therefore nonappealable. (Code Civ. Proc., 437c, subd. (m)(1); Levy v. Skywalker Sound (2003) 108 Cal.App.4th 753, 761, fn. 7; Stolz v. Wong Communications Limited Partnership (1994) 25 Cal.App.4th 1811, 1816.) Please provide the court with an appealable judgment within 15 days of the date of this notice with proof of service on opposing party(ies). (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 8.25(a)(1)-(2).) If no final judgment has been entered, then you are requested to demonstrate in writing why the appeal should not be dismissed as having been taken from a nonappealable order. Failure to provide an appealable judgment or file a response within the time provided may result in the appeal being dismissed without further notice. (Sherman v. Standard Mines Co. (1913) 166 Cal. 524, 525.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Association of counsel within firm. Bradley Charles Clark of Schmid & Voiles associates Denise H Greer of Schmid & Voiles as attorney of record for respondent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Rita Simonyans Attorney: Louis F. Teran

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Rita SimonyansAttorney: Louis F. Teran

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on August 12, 2021 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant's filing fee paid via credit card.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on July 2, 2021 by Rita Simonyans

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV46544; Trial Court Judge: Moreton, Jr., Edward

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less