Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 05/06/2021 at 07:24:43 (UTC).

Silva v. City of Los Angeles et al.

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Silva filed an Other lawsuit against City of Los Angeles. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kwan, Ruth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8601

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District - Division 2

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kwan, Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Kildare Lima Silva

Defendants and Respondents

City of Los Angeles

Shelter Clean Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

George Vasilios Choulos

Attorney at Choulos Choulos & Wyle LLP

275 Battery St Ste 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Dikran H. Sassounian

Attorney at Office of City Attorney

200 N. Main Street City Hall East Room 600

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Sara Ugaz

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

200 North Main Street 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Zachary Charles Hansen

Attorney at Wood Smith Henning & Berman, LLP

10960 Wilshire Blvd Fl 18

Los Angeles, CA 90024-3804

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Zachary C. Hansen of Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman LLP dated 3/9/2021 re: update the handling attorney contact information for respondent Shelter Clean Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of intra-office substitution of assigned attorney. Deputy City Attorney Sara Ugaz is substituted in place of Managing Assistant City Attorney Dikran H. Sassounian as counsel of record for respondent City of Los Angeles.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Kildare Lima Silva Attorney: George Vasilios Choulos AMENDED: a copy of the December 2, 2020 judgment is attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 05/24/2021; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Kildare Lima SilvaAttorney: George Vasilios Choulos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Kildare Lima SilvaAttorney: George Vasilios Choulos; Notes: AMENDED: a copy of the December 2, 2020 judgment is attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Appellant's counsel: The Civil Case Information Statement was filed on November 17, 2020. If you are appealing from an order granting a summary judgment motion, then you will need to provide a copy of the judgment rendered on the order. No direct appeal lies from an order granting a motion for summary judgment. Instead, the appeal lies from the judgment entered after the order granting a summary judgment motion. Please provide the court with an appealable judgment within 15 days from the date of this notice with proof of service on opposing party. If no final judgment has been entered, you are requested to demonstrate in writing, why the appeal should not be dismissed as being taken from a non-appealable judgment/order. Failure to provide an appealable judgment/order or file a response within the time provided may result in the appeal being dismissed without further notice. (Cal. Rule of Court, rule 8.100(g).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Kildare Lima Silva Attorney: George Vasilios Choulos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Kildare Lima SilvaAttorney: George Vasilios Choulos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Appellant's designation filed 11.04.20 - appendix with reporter's transcript.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil Filing Fee Paid via Check Kildare Lima Silva, Plaintiff and Appellant George Vasilios Choulos, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Oct. 30, 2020: Kildare Lima Silva

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC696664; Trial Court Judge: Kwan, Ruth

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases where SHELTER CLEAN SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANSEN ZACHARY C.