This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/22/2021 at 02:41:19 (UTC).

Sierra Club v. RCS Harmony Partners, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 Sierra Club filed an Other lawsuit against RCS Harmony Partners, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bacal, Katherine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9518

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bacal, Katherine

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Sierra Club

Appellant and Interested Party

RCS Harmony Partners, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua Randall Chatten-Brown

Attorney at Chatten-Brown, Carstens & Minteer LLP

302 Washintong Street, #710

San Diego, CA 92103

Appellant and Interested Party Attorney

Richard A. Schulman

Attorney at Richard A. Schulman, APC

9834 Apple Tree Dr., Unit C.

San Diego, CA 92124

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • HearingDescription: REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT FILED***; Notes: Clerk's rule 8.124 and Reporter's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Transcript fees paid.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR, Ross: 5/14/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: RCS Harmony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed Sept. 20, 2021 by HARMONY PARTNERS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2018-00043084-CU-TT-CTL; Trial Court Judge: Bacal, Katherine

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RCS-Harmony Partners, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sierra Club is a litigant