This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/07/2021 at 00:06:09 (UTC).

Shurwest, LLC v. Superior Court for the County of Marin

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 Shurwest, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the County of Marin. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chou, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0464

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Chou, James

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Shurwest, LLC

Respondent

Superior Court for the County of Marin

Interested Party

George Geoffrey Leland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Miles Michael Cooley

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

2000 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4704

Jeanette Eva Barzelay

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

555 Mission St Ste 2400 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105--922

Interested Party Attorneys

Tracey Berger Cowan

Attorney at Peiffer Wolf Carr & Kane

4 Embarcadero Ctr Ste 1400

San Francisco, CA 94111-4164

Adam Brett Wolf

Attorney at Peiffer Wolf Carr & Kane

4 Embarcadero Ctr Ste 1400

San Francisco, CA 94111-4164

Timothy Weston Fredricks

Attorney at Winget Spadafora & Schwartzberg LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars Ste 450

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4312

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Shipped to state retention center, box # / list #:; Notes: Note: Entire file electronic.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final THE COURT*: The requests for judicial notice filed on August 19, 2020, and September 9, 2020, are granted. The petition for writ of mandate or other appropriate relief is denied. * Pollak, P.J., Streeter, J., and Tucher, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT*: The requests for judicial notice filed on August 19, 2020, and September 9, 2020, are granted. The petition for writ of mandate or other appropriate relief is denied. * Pollak, P.J., Streeter, J., and Tucher, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: Real Party in Interest George Geoffrey Leland's Second Request and Motion for Judical Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: For preliminary reply

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: For preliminary reply

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Preliminary Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandate, or Other Appropriate Relief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: Real Party in Interst George Geoffrey Leland's Request and Motion for Judicial Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Real Party in Interest George Goffrey Leland's Preliminary Opposition to the Petition for Writ of Mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Opinion: 199 Cal.App.4th 383 Court of Appeal, Sixth District, California. AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK, Plaintiff and Respondent, v. Robert V. ZARA, Defendant and Appellant. No. H036216. Sept. 20, 2011.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Opinion: 148 Cal.App.4th 556 Court of Appeal, Fourth District, Division 1, California. AQUILA, INC., Petitioner, v. The SUPERIOR COURT of San Diego County, Respondent; City and County of San Francisco, et al., Real Parties in Interest. No. D048963. March 13, 2007.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: 209 Cal.App.3d 1266, 258 Cal.Rptr. 66 OMAHA INDEMNITY COMPANY, Petitioner, v. THE SUPERIOR COURT OF SANTA BARBARA COUNTY, Respondent; FRANK GREINKE et al., Real Parties In Interest No. B036158. Court of Appeal, Second District, California. Apr 26, 1989.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Opinion: 169 Cal.App.3d 703, 215 Cal.Rptr. 442 LAWRENCE F. MIHLON et al., Petitioners, v. THE SUPERIOR COURT OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY, Respondent; RICHARD F. MURKEY, Real Party in Interest. No. B010323. Court of Appeal, Second District, Division 4, California. Jun 25, 1985.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Opinion: 190 Cal.App.4th 421 Court of Appeal, Second District, Division 4, California. BBA AVIATION PLC, Petitioner, v. The SUPERIOR COURT of Los Angeles County, Respondent, Charles Engen, Real Party in Interest. No. B219289. Nov. 23, 2010.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Appendendix of Exhibits - 3 volumes, 19 tabsVOLUME 3 OF 3, TABS 8 - 19, PAGES AA 428 - AA 731

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Chronological Index of ExhibitsVOLUME 2 OF 3, TAB 7, PAGES AA 164 -AA 427

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: VOLUME 1 OF 3, TABS 1 - 7, PAGES AA 1 -AA 163

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate or Other Appropriate Relief Stay Requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Marin County Superior Court; County: Marin; Trial Court Case Number: CIV1900627; Trial Court Judge: Chou, James

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Shurwest, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court for the County of Marin is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Miles Michael Cooley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeanette Eva Barzelay