This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 01/27/2021 at 06:03:59 (UTC).

Shurwest, LLC v. Superior Court

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Shurwest, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Barrett, Thang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8361

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Barrett, Thang

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Shurwest, LLC

Respondent

The Superior Court of Santa Clara County

Interested Party

Mary Anne Dennis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Miles Michael Cooley

Attorney at DLA PIPER LLP (US)

2000 Avenue Of The Stars Ste 400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4704

Jeanette Eva Barzelay

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

555 Mission St 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-922

Interested Party Attorneys

Tracey Berger Cowan

Attorney at Peiffer Wolf Carr & Kane

4 Embarcadero Ctr Ste 1400

San Francisco, CA 94111-4164

Adam Brett Wolf

Attorney at Peiffer Wolf Carr & Kane

5042 Wilshire Blvd., No. 304

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: No opo filed as of 9/8/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: Vol. 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: Vol. 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: Vol. 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: Vol. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate With corrected bookmarks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Misc westlaw penal code documents rejected, missing coversheet, table of contents, bookmarks, and pagination.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Corrected to include service to Santa Clara Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: Vol. 2 of 2*Over 300 pgs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: Vol. 1 of 2*Over 300 pgs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: * * * Missing correct bookmarks, POS shows service to Marin County Superior Court and not Santa Clara * * ** * * Stay Requested * * *

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Shurwest, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Santa Clara County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Miles Michael Cooley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeanette Eva Barzelay