This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/10/2023 at 19:01:29 (UTC).

SHR St. Francis, LLC et al. v. City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 SHR St Francis, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ulmer, Jr., Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3847

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ulmer, Jr., Richard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

SHR St. Francis, LLC

Strategic Hotels and Resorts, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

City and County of San Francisco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Cris K. O'Neall

Colin W. Fraser

Ruben Sislyan

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Moneer H. Jamil

Peter J. Keith

Scott Reiber

David Sen-Fu Chiu

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Greenberg Traurig, attorneys for SHR St. Francis, re newly-decided authority; copy of opinion attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of Reassignment of Counsel from attorney Peter Keith for respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Reply in support of motion for judicial notice, from Greenberg Traurig, attorneys for appellant SHR St. Francis "Received but not filed"; deferred to author of opinion; see court's order filed 1/5/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellant filed an "Application for leave to file reply brief in support of motion for judicial notice" on January 4, 2023. The court defers consideration of this application to the author of the opinion in this case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Application filed to:; Notes: Application for leave to file reply brief in support of motion for judicial notice; from Greenberg Traurig, attorneys for appellants SHR St. Francis et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Opposition to appellant's motion for judicial notice; from the San Francisco City Attorney's office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: attorney Frederick Sheinfield for respondent; personal appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: attorney Colin Fraser for appellants; personal appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Ruling on request for judicial notice deferred.; Notes: Appellants SHR St. Francis, LLC et al filed a request for judicial notice on November 29, 2022. The court defers consideration of this request to the author of the opinion in this case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-3(e-filed), R-2(e-filed) **Entire Record Electronic**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Transmittal Sheet From SF Superior Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Rec'd co. notice to appellant re: estimate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 11/4/21; by Greenberg Traurig, attorneys for appellant SHR St. Francis; designating clerk's and reporter's transcripts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: From: SF Superior Court Check issued: 3820006842 Date issued 11/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: SHR St. Francis, LLC Attorney: Colin W. Fraser

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: SHR St. Francis, LLCAttorney: Colin W. Fraser

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: filed 10-25-21 by counsel for plaintiffs from judgment of 10-14-21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC20582772; Trial Court Judge: Ulmer, Jr., Richard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less