This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/12/2021 at 01:54:55 (UTC).

Shepherd v. Superior Court Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 Shepherd filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cowan, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4115

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cowan, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Latoya Shepherd

Respondent

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Doris Scott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Hana Kommel

Attorney at Bet Tzedek Legal Services

3250 Wilshire Blvd Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Edward James Elsner

Attorney at Bet Tzedek Legal Services

3250 Wilshire Blvd Fl 13

Los Angeles, CA 90010-1601

Respondent Attorneys

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Hon. David J. Cowan

Attorney at Dept. 1

Los Angeles Superior Court 210 West Temple St.

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Jeffrey Brad Endler

Attorney at Endler McDaniel & Associates

14450 Ventura Blvd., Suite 3

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Grace Lou

Attorney at The Law Offices of Grace A. Lou,

3828 Carson Street Suite 102

Torrance, CA 90503

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: We have read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on August 10, 2021 and the letter petitioner filed on September 30, 2021. Petitioner does not show she lacks available remedies in the superior court. She therefore does not establish entitlement to writ relief. Accordingly, the petition is denied. STRATTON, Acting P. J. WILEY, J. OHTA, J.*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: RPI's letter brief was due on 09/30/2021 none was filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter brief filed.; Notes: Petitioner: Latoya Shepherd Attorney: Hana Kommel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketBrief: Letter brief filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner: Latoya ShepherdAttorney: Hana Kommel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: We have read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on August 10, 2021. We understand the probate court in case number 19STPB11524 issued an order on September 17, 2021. Petitioner shall file a letter brief of not more than five pages in length by September 30, 2021 addressing what effect, if any, this probate court order has on her petition. Real party may also file a letter brief not longer than five pages by September 30, 2021 addressing the same issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: APPLICATION - APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits filed in support of: Volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Filed petition for writ of: Civil Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOU, GRACE A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ENDLER JEFFREY B. ESQ.