This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 03/09/2021 at 02:17:10 (UTC).

Shen v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 Shen filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mandel, Elaine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6823

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mandel, Elaine

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jinrong Shen

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Elaine W. Mandel

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Interested Party

DEFAULT RECOVERIES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Bruce Aric Fields

Attorney at Law Offices of Fei Pang

411 E. Huntington Dr., Ste 206

Arcadia, CA 91006

John Benjamin Ekenes

Attorney at John L. Dodd & Associates

17621 Irvine Blvd Ste 200

Tustin, CA 92780

John L. Dodd

Attorney at John L. Dodd and Associates

17621 Irvine Blvd. Suite 200

Tustin, CA 92780

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Samantha Alice Gavin

Attorney at Michelman & Robinson LLP

17901 Von Karman Ave 10Fl

Irvine, CA 92614

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The request for judicial notice is granted. The petition for review and application for stay are denied. [S263913]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.; Notes: E-Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed August 3, 2020. The petition is denied. (Rockefeller Technology Investments (Asia) VII v. Changzhou SinoType Technology Co., Ltd. (2020) 9 Cal.5th 125, 141; Vorburg v. Vorburg (1941) 18 Cal.2d 794, 796; County of Fresno v. Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Ass'n (2020) 51 Cal.App.5th 282, 264 Cal.Rptr. 534, 543; Szynalski v. Superior Court (2009) 172 Cal.App.4th 1, 7-8.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The immediate stay request is denied. (Code Civ. Proc., 418.10, subd. (e)(2).) The court intends to rule on the petition prior to the October 14, 2020 case management conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Petitioner's notice of correction to email address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Petition for Writ of Mandate. STAY REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samantha Alice Gavin